U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haggins et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Recommendation]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Public Docket Annotation]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • June 17, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.