U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 27, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.