U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02814-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hutchins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.