U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bidwell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.