U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02956-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McAbee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify (Other)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Modify (Other)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.