U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00011
  • Case Name: Wesley Financial Group, LLC v. Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Create Case Relationship]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 20, 2021: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.