U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02000-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gleaves
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2021: [Detention]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.