U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00069
  • Case Name: Tennessee State Conference of the NAACP v. Lee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 20, 2021: [Quash]
  • October 20, 2021: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.