U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-02002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED Memo in Support of Leave to File Doc Under Seal ONLY]
  • April 05, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • January 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2022: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 12, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.