U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kozeluh
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Response (non-motion)]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 10, 2022: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 09, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • February 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 09, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support (non-motion)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Reassignment]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 19, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.