U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2022: [Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Writ]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.