U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romain
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.