U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blackwell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 08, 2022: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Complaint]
  • December 08, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.