U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-mj-01257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Payne
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.