U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tilley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.