U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Request for Preservation and Discovery Materials]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum & Order: Arraignment on Indictment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.