U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sparks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Indictment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum & Order: Arraignment on Indictment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Request for Preservation and Discovery Materials]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.