U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Request for Preservation and Discovery Materials]
  • April 03, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum & Order: Arraignment on Indictment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.