U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10037-12
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cole et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - 2023 USSC Amendment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - 2023 USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.