U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gaylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [Court Reporter's Certification of Audio Recording]
  • April 10, 2025: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Judge for Change of Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Enter a Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.