U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00028-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dotson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 18, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 17, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.