U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Britt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Sealed Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Acceptance of Responsibility (U.S.S.G. - 3E1.1(b))]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.