U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10079-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 04, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.