U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres-Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Judge for Change of Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.