U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-20217-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Report Date]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Setting Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.