U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sentencing Document Under Seal]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Sentencing Document Under Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sentencing Document Under Seal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Sentencing Document Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.