U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20059-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Austin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Issuing Writ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.