U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20058-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Brooks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Report Date]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.