U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20064-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Report Date]
  • April 18, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Issuing Writ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.