U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitaker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Court Reporter's Certification of Audio Recording]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.