U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.