U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20067-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report Date]
  • April 15, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.