U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20065-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Tate et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 29, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 29, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 24, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.