U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20062-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.