U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20061-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lucas-Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report Date]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order for Interpreter Services]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.