U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White (TV1)
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.