U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.