U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10017-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Elizalde-Caldera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order for Interpreter Services]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order for Interpreter Services]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 16 Discovery]
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 31, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.