U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Court Reporter's Certification of Audio Recording]
  • April 11, 2025: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Judge for Change of Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.