U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.