U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20072-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Wells et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Bond ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Indictment (Penalty Copy)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.