U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:09-cr-20069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Becker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Setting Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.