U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00069-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Salim et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.