U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matlock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Petition and Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Petition and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.