U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00074-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Inthirakod et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.