U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.