U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-20013-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Newsome et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Re: Criminal Rule 5(f)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.