U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20028-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Setting Letter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.