U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 08, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Indictment-Redacted]
  • April 08, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.