U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brumley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.